+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2020
- Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/16-127 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-127
+ − Votes (3)
January 11, 2021: SB3027 - Personnel & Pensions
March 4, 2020: SB3027 - Third Reading
February 26, 2020: SB3027 - Government Accountability/Pensions
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor