+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant
- Arrived in House
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-010-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-002-001
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Asignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-002
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, if authorized by the fire chief of the fire department, any regularly enrolled volunteer fire fighter may purchase 4 vehicle tires every 3 years through his or her fire department's or municipality's joint purchasing contract relating to the purchase of vehicle tires. Further provides that the firefighter shall cover the cost of the tires and any related taxes. Limits applicability. Amends the Fire Protection District Act making similar changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 70 ILCS 705/16 - from Ch. 127 1/2, par. 37
- 65 ILCS 5/11-6-9 new -
- 70 ILCS 705/10d new -
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2016: SB3025 - Third Reading
May 25, 2016: SFA0002 - Local Government
March 17, 2016: SB3025 - Local Government
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor