+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1101
- Effective Date January 1, 2011
- Governor Approved
On May 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010
- Second Reading
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010
- Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/3-623 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-623