+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William E. Peterson
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 775 ILCS 5/1-102 - from Ch. 68, par. 1-102
- 775 ILCS 5/1-103 - from Ch. 68, par. 1-103
- 775 ILCS 5/3-102 - from Ch. 68, par. 3-102
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor