+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions and Investments
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-154 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-154
- 30 ILCS 805/8.34 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor