+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0870
- Effective Date August 22, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Collins
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-003
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Changes the date upon which the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall begin providing medical assistance coverage to foreign-born victims of human trafficking, torture, or other serious crimes from January 1, 2017 to January 1, 2018. Provides that such coverage shall be subject to federal approval. Makes changes to provisions concerning eligibility criteria and adds a provision concerning the extension of benefits under certain conditions. Provides that the program is inoperative on and after June 30, 2019. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 305 ILCS 5/1-11 -
- 305 ILCS 5/2-19 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-2
- 305 ILCS 5/Art. XVI heading new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-1 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-2 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-3 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-4 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-5 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/16-6 new -
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2016: SB3007 - Third Reading
May 17, 2016: SB3007 - Appropriations-Human Services
April 21, 2016: SB3007 - Third Reading
April 20, 2016: SFA0003 - Human Services
March 16, 2016: SB3007 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor