+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0748
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2022: SB3006 - Third Reading
March 15, 2022: SB3006 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
February 23, 2022: SB3006 - Third Reading
February 8, 2022: SB3006 - Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor