+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor