+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0400
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1, from the Office of the Secretary of State.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary Criminal Law
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02--May 23, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Drivers Education & Safety Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Drivers Education & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-000
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, with various changes. In the State Finance Act, provides for creation of the Indigent BAIID Fund and the Monitoring Device Driving Permit Administration Fee Fund (rather than the Alcohol Monitoring Device Fund). Provides that a first offender who receives a statutory summary suspension shall be issued a monitoring device driving permit (rather than a monitoring device driver's license), except under specified circumstances. Provides that a person issued a monitoring device driving permit may not drive a commercial vehicle. Establishes other restrictions. Provides that a person who received a judicial driving permit before the effective date of the amendatory Act may continue to drive on that permit. Provides that a person who fails to comply with the requirements of a monitoring device driving permit commits the offense of driving on a revoked or suspended license. Provides that a person who holds a monitoring device driving permit convicted of the offense for driving a vehicle not equipped with an ignition interlock device, or a person eligible for a monitoring device driving permit convicted of driving with a drug or alcohol-related summary suspension, is guilty of a Class 4 felony and subject to 30 days of imprisonment. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person who commits one of these offenses is not eligible for court supervision. Changes the effective date from January 1, 2008 to January 1, 2009.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, with various changes. In the State Finance Act, provides for creation of the Indigent BAIID Fund and the Monitoring Device Driving Permit Administration Fee Fund (rather than the Alcohol Monitoring Device Fund). Provides that a first offender who receives a statutory summary suspension shall be issued a monitoring device driving permit (rather than a monitoring device driver's license), except under specified circumstances. Provides that a person issued a monitoring device driving permit may not drive a commercial vehicle. Establishes other restrictions. Provides that a person who received a judicial driving permit before the effective date of the amendatory Act may continue to drive on that permit. Provides that a person who fails to comply with the requirements of a monitoring device driving permit commits the offense of driving on a revoked or suspended license. Provides that a person who holds a monitoring device driving permit convicted of the offense for driving a vehicle not equipped with an ignition interlock device, or a person eligible for a monitoring device driving permit convicted of driving with a drug or alcohol-related summary suspension, is guilty of a Class 4 felony and subject to 30 days of imprisonment. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person who commits one of these offenses is not eligible for court supervision. Changes the effective date from January 1, 2008 to January 1, 2009.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the State Finance Act. Makes various changes regarding the consequences of a statutory summary suspension for DUI. Provides that a first offender who receives statutory summary suspension shall be issued a monitoring device driver's license (rather than a judicial driving permit, or JDP). Deletes all references to judicial driving permits. Provides that a person issued a monitoring device license must either: (i) drive only a vehicle or vehicles equipped with an ignition interlock device; or (ii) use an alternative alcohol monitoring device, 24 hours per day. Provides that a holder of this type of license may drive for any purpose and at any time, subject to rules to be adopted by the Secretary of State. Specifies certain issues that these rules shall address, including the consequences of noncompliance with the requirements of the monitoring device driver's license. Provides that the rules shall also prescribe the duties of any person or entity that supplies these devices. Provides that a percentage of the gross revenue from these devices shall be paid into the Alcohol Monitoring Device Fund. Creates the Alcohol Monitoring Device Fund in the State treasury. Provides that all moneys in the Fund shall be paid to the Secretary of State to supply these devices to indigent persons. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2008.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/1-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 1-101