+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date May 6, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0747
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Healthcare Access and Availability; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2022: SB2993 - Third Reading
March 24, 2022: SB2993 - Mental Health & Addiction
February 16, 2022: SB2993 - Third Reading
January 18, 2022: SB2993 - Healthcare Access and Availability
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor