+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau