+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Transportation
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor