+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael Noland
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-017-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-002-000
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-009-001
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act. Defines "roof repair". In provisions concerning the application of the Act, provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to require a person who performs roof repair (rather than roofing) or waterproofing work to his or her employer's property to be licensed as a roofing contractor, where there exists an employer-employee relationship.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 335/11 - from Ch. 111, par. 7511
- 225 ILCS 335/2 - from Ch. 111, par. 7502