+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1108
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 011-000-000
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2014
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Provides that the statement of the financial affairs of the township prepared and filed for the annual township meeting is unaudited.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2014: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Friday, May 30, 2014
May 20, 2014: SB2980 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2014
March 5, 2014: SB2980 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 05, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor