+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0835
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-036-000
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 805/13 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 6323
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2014: SB2975 - Third Reading - Friday, May 09, 2014
April 1, 2014: SB2975 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor