+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e), January 11, 2005.
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Todd Sieben
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
- Second Reading
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Makes a technical change in the provision setting forth the amount of the exemption beginning in taxable year 2004.