+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1093
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Governor Approved
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne Ness
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
- Arrived in House
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
- Recalled to Second Reading
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022
- Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024 (rather than 2023) shall provide coverage for medically necessary continuous glucose monitors for individuals who are diagnosed with type 1 or type 2 diabetes and require insulin for the management of their diabetes (rather than provide coverage for continuous glucose monitors).
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.43 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.53 new -
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2022: SB2969 - Third Reading
April 6, 2022: SB2969 - Insurance
February 25, 2022: SB2969 - Third Reading
February 23, 2022: SFA0001 - Insurance
January 12, 2022: SB2969 - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor