+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 007-005-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning notices of cancellation.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor