+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor