+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 205/8 - from Ch. 144, par. 188
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor