+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0820
- Effective Date May 13, 2022
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy and Public Utilities
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - April 4, 2022
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 024-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 31, 2022
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2022
- Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022
- Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
In the Electric Vehicle Rebate Act, provides that beginning July 1, 2028, each person shall be eligible to apply for a $1,500 (rather than $1,000) rebate for the purchase of an electric vehicle that is not an electric motorcycle.
Senate Amendment 001
In provisions amending the Electric Vehicle Act and the Electric Vehicle Rebate Act, provides that "electric vehicle" does not include electric mopeds or electric off-highway vehicles. Further amends the Electric Vehicle Rebate Act. Provides that only electric vehicles that are not an electric motorcycle qualify for specified rebates. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2022, each person shall be eligible to apply for a $1,500 rebate for the purchase of an electric vehicle that is an electric motorcycle. Provides that purchasers applying for a rebate must continue to reside in Illinois (rather than a covered area) for a minimum of 12 consecutive months immediately after the vehicle purchase date. Provides that rebates administered under the provisions shall be available for both new and used electric vehicles (rather than for new and used passenger electric vehicles).