+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
- Postponed - Agriculture
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 520 ILCS 5/1.1 - from Ch. 61, par. 1.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor