+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
- Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/2A-1.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 2A-1.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor