+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-019-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On July 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-044-002
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-016-000
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-001-000
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2405/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 3434
+ − Votes (5)
November 16, 2016: SB2931 - Motion
May 18, 2016: SB2931 - Third Reading
May 17, 2016: SB2931 - Appropriations-Human Services
May 11, 2016: SB2931 - Third Reading
April 5, 2016: SB2931 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor