+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Public Health
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Education
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-20.14b - from Ch. 122, par. 10-20.14b
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.21b - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.21b
- 225 ILCS 65/50-15 - was 225 ILCS 65/5-15
- 225 ILCS 65/50-75 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor