+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020
- Second Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020
- Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: SB2925 - Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor