+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On December 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1076
- Effective Date December 29, 2006
- Governor Approved
On December 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
On November 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance
On November 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 16, 2006
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
On November 14, 2006 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Tryon
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael Tryon
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On November 2, 2006 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 9, 2007
- Rules Refers to 2nd Reading
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2006 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 5, 2006
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 30, 2006
On April 7, 2006 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 13, 2006
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Insurance Committee
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 7, 2006
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 14, 2006
- Second Reading
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 9, 2006
- Do Pass Insurance; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to extend the repeal date of certain Articles of the Illinois Insurance Code until January 1, 2017. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to require coverage of medically necessary preventative physical therapy for insureds diagnosed with multiple sclerosis. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
November 29, 2006: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, November 29, 2006
November 14, 2006: SB2917 - Third Reading - Tuesday, November 14, 2006
February 16, 2006: SB2917 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 16, 2006
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor