+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor