+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Bill Cunningham
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady