+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2016: SB2902 - Third Reading
March 17, 2016: SB2902 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor