+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor