+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0945
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 18, 2004.
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Consumer Protection Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 008-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Labor & Commerce; 008-000-001
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that the Act applies to a gift certificate or gift card that contain any type of post-sale charge or fee, including but not limited to, service charges, dormancy fees, account maintenance fees, cash-out fees, replacement card fees, and activation or reactivation charges. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that any gift certificate subject to a fee must contain a statement clearly and conspicuously printed on the gift card stating whether there is a fee and other related information. Provides that any gift certificate subject to an expiration date must contain a statement clearly and conspicuously printed on the gift card stating the expiration date. Provides that the statement may appear on the front or back of the gift card in a location where it is visible to any purchaser prior to the purchase. Defines "gift certificates".
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that the Act applies to a gift certificate or gift card that contain any type of post-sale charge or fee, including but not limited to, service charges, dormancy fees, account maintenance fees, cash-out fees, replacement card fees, and activation or reactivation charges. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that any gift certificate subject to a fee must contain a statement clearly and conspicuously printed on the gift card stating whether there is a fee and other related information. Provides that any gift certificate subject to an expiration date must contain a statement clearly and conspicuously printed on the gift card stating the expiration date. Provides that the statement may appear on the front or back of the gift card in a location where it is visible to any purchaser prior to the purchase. Defines "gift certificates".