+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0366
- Effective Date August 23, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Local Government
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes a provision of the introduced bill that allows the State Treasurer to accept proposals for linked-deposit.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes a provision of the introduced bill that allows the State Treasurer to accept proposals for linked-deposit.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2007: SB0290 - Third Reading - Monday, May 28, 2007
March 29, 2007: SB0290 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 29, 2007
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor