+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0957
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 19, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Licensed Activities
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Munoz
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 18, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Motion Withdrawn Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Registration and Regulation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Registration and Regulation Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-009-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Munoz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Munoz
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts similar provisions with these changes: defines "exclusive brokerage agreement" and provides that exclusive brokerage agreements must specify that the sponsoring broker must, at a minimum, accept delivery of and present to the client offers and counteroffers to but, sell, or lease the client's property or the property the client seeks to purchase or lease, assist the client in developing, communicating, negotiating, and presenting offers, counteroffers, and notices that relate to the offers and counteroffers until a lease or purchase agreement is signed and all contingencies are satisfied or waived and answer the client's questions relating to the offers, counteroffers, notices, and contingencies; deletes language providing that certain educational requirements do not apply to applicants who show evidence of receiving a baccalaureate degree including courses involving real estate or related material from a college or university approved by the Advisory Council; makes changes concerning the 6-hour broker management continuing education course; provides that the Office of Banks and Real Estate shall contract with the Illinois Real Estate Education Foundation to develop the 6-hour broker management continuing education course and may license the use of that course to all approved continuing education providers and that the Office of Banks and Real Estate shall contract with the provider of the testing service for licensure as a broker or salesperson to develop and administer an appropriate test to be taken in connection with the 6-hour broker management continuing education course; adds immediate effective date.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts similar provisions with these changes: defines "exclusive brokerage agreement" and provides that exclusive brokerage agreements must specify that the sponsoring broker must, at a minimum, accept delivery of and present to the client offers and counteroffers to but, sell, or lease the client's property or the property the client seeks to purchase or lease, assist the client in developing, communicating, negotiating, and presenting offers, counteroffers, and notices that relate to the offers and counteroffers until a lease or purchase agreement is signed and all contingencies are satisfied or waived and answer the client's questions relating to the offers, counteroffers, notices, and contingencies; deletes language providing that certain educational requirements do not apply to applicants who show evidence of receiving a baccalaureate degree including courses involving real estate or related material from a college or university approved by the Advisory Council; makes changes concerning the 6-hour broker management continuing education course; provides that the Office of Banks and Real Estate shall contract with the Illinois Real Estate Education Foundation to develop the 6-hour broker management continuing education course and may license the use of that course to all approved continuing education providers and that the Office of Banks and Real Estate shall contract with the provider of the testing service for licensure as a broker or salesperson to develop and administer an appropriate test to be taken in connection with the 6-hour broker management continuing education course; adds immediate effective date.