+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1031
- Effective Date August 27, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 007-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02,03
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02,03 - May 29, 2004.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2004
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William B. Black
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Older Adult Services Act and amends the Illinois Act on the Aging, the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act, the State Finance Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the purpose of the Older Adult Services Act is to promote a transformation of Illinois' comprehensive system of older adult services from funding a primarily facility-based service delivery system to primarily a home-based and community-based system, taking into account the continuing need for 24-hour skilled nursing care and congregate housing with services. Provides that the Department on Aging is the lead agency for the provision of services to older adults and their family caregivers and shall collaborate with the departments of Public Health and Public Aid in providing those services. Provides for an advisory committee to advise the departments. Requires the Department on Aging to expand older adult services that promote independence and permit older adults to remain in their own homes and communities, and creates the Older Adult Services Fund to fund older adult services. Requires the Department on Aging to restructure the older adult services delivery system, including implementation of a nursing home conversion program to reduce the number of Medicaid-certified nursing home beds in areas with excess beds, and creates the Nursing Home Conversion Fund to fund grants to nursing homes as an incentive to reduce certified beds, retrofit, and retool operations to meet new service delivery expectations and demands. Provides that a conversion project funded in whole or in part by a grant is exempt from the requirements of the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides that a provision of the State Finance Act concerning transfers to the General Revenue Fund does not apply to the Nursing Home Conversion Fund or the Older Adult Services Fund. Requires the Department of Public Aid to apply for necessary waivers to facilitate the transition from one residential setting to another and follow-up services. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Authorizes the Illinois Finance Authority to assist the Department of Public Health and nursing homes in undertaking nursing home conversion projects in accordance with the Older Adult Services Act.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Authorizes the Illinois Finance Authority to assist the Department of Public Health and nursing homes in undertaking nursing home conversion projects in accordance with the Older Adult Services Act.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides for the appointment of a Housing, Health, and Supportive Services for Older Adults Coordinating Committee (Coordinating Committee), and provides for its functions. Provides that the Director of Aging, in collaboration with the directors of Public Health and Public Aid and in consultation with the Coordinating Committee (instead of the Director of Public Health, in coordination with the directors of Aging and Public Aid) shall monitor and analyze the distribution of services for older adults in each geographic area of the State. Provides that the Director of Aging (in addition to the directors of Public Health and Public Aid) shall identify barriers to the provision of long term care services and implement a plan to address those barriers. Provides for the involvement of the Department on Aging and the departments of Public Health and Public Aid in the nursing home conversion program. Provides that the Illinois Finance Authority shall provide information to the Department of Public Aid to enable that Department to document and verify Medicaid savings attributable to the nursing home conversion program (instead of the Illinois Finance Authority documenting and verifying such savings). Provides for the involvement of the Department on Aging and the Department of Public Aid in the nursing home transition planning grant program. Further amends the State Finance Act. Changes the name of the Alternative Long-Term Care Services for Older Adults Fund to the Long-Term Care Services for Older Adults Fund, and provides that that fund, the Nursing Home Conversion Fund, and the Nursing Home Transition Planning Grant Fund are not subject to the provisions of the State Finance Act concerning transfers from other funds to the General Revenue Fund. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 3960/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1153
- 30 ILCS 105/5.621 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.622 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.623 new -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-103 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4153-103