+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1017
- Effective Date August 24, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02-May 26, 2004
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 018-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-026-000
- Verified
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed March 26, 2004
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by Senate Amendment No. 1, from the Illinois Department of Human Rights.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Human Rights.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts provisions of the engrossed bill, except: adds language providing that the Attorney General may commence a civil action if the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that any person or group of persons is engaged in a pattern and practice of discrimination prohibited by the Act; deletes language regarding the computation of the 2-year limitation period; makes other changes. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts provisions of the engrossed bill, except: adds language providing that the Attorney General may commence a civil action if the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that any person or group of persons is engaged in a pattern and practice of discrimination prohibited by the Act; deletes language regarding the computation of the 2-year limitation period; makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything and re-inserts provisions of the introduced bill, except: requires civil penalties and damages directed by the court to be paid to the State under specified provisions to be deposited into the Attorney General Court Ordered and Voluntary Compliance Payment Projects Fund; eliminates provisions requiring the court to award the State as monetary relief threefold the amount of profits that accrued to the Respondent by reason of the act, conduct, practice, or system challenged in the suit; provides for specified civil penalties and types of equitable relief; deletes provisions regarding determination of attorney's fees; and makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 775 ILCS 5/10-101 - from Ch. 68, par. 10-101
- 775 ILCS 5/10-104 new -