+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2008
- Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the training expense credit earned on or after December 31, 2009 may be carried forward.
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201
+ − Vote
April 17, 2008: SB2854 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 17, 2008
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor