+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0664
- Effective Date October 11, 2007
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 071-041-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On October 4, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 10, 2007
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On October 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 2, 2007
On August 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 007-004-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 1005/10 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 83