+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On November 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 16, 2004 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Lou Lang
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
On November 10, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2004
- Arrived in House
On November 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 049-004-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Donne E. Trotter
On November 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 8, 2004
On August 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2004 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-009-001
On May 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Dan Reitz
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Dan Reitz
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. William B. Black
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Angelo Saviano
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Public Aid
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale E. Risinger
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-001
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
November 9, 2004: SB2847 - Motion - Tuesday, November 09, 2004
May 31, 2004: SB2847 - Third Reading - Monday, May 31, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2847 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (121)
Type:
Primary Sponsor