+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/1-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 1-2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor