+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0929
- Effective Date August 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Lawrence M. Walsh
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Lawrence M. Walsh
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02-May 19, 2004.
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Aging Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Aging Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Aging Committee
- Assigned to Aging Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter-Walsh
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter; -Walsh
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lawrence M. Walsh
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Excellence in Alzheimer's Disease Center Treatment Act. Creates the Alzheimer's Disease Center Clinical Fund, the Alzheimer's Disease Center Expanded Clinical Fund, and the Alzheimer's Disease Center Independent Clinical Fund (and amends the State Finance Act to include those Funds as special funds) to be allocated to qualified academic medical center hospitals in a specified manner for enumerated purposes related to Alzheimer's Disease care, outreach, research, education, a brain banking program, and administration. Contains provisions concerning payments, reporting, reimbursements, and other matters. Makes other changes. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Center for Minority Health Services shall promote awareness of the incidence of Alzheimer's disease and related dementias among minority populations and encourage, promote, and aid in the establishment of prevention and treatment programs and services relating to Alzheimer's disease. Amends the Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Act. Provides that Alzheimer's disease and related disorders affect an estimated 4,500,000 (rather than 1,500,000) Americans and approximately 200,000 (rather than 111,000) Illinois citizens. Provides that the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee shall review and evaluate State programs and services provided by State agencies that are directed toward persons with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias, and recommend changes to improve the State's response to this health problem. Provides that payments to hospitals affiliated with each Regional Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Center shall be effected through the Illinois Department of Public Aid under the Excellence in Alzheimer's Disease Center Treatment Act. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Excellence in Alzheimer's Disease Center Treatment Act. Creates the Alzheimer's Disease Center Clinical Fund, the Alzheimer's Disease Center Expanded Clinical Fund, and the Alzheimer's Disease Center Independent Clinical Fund (and amends the State Finance Act to include those Funds as special funds) to be allocated to qualified academic medical center hospitals in a specified manner for enumerated purposes related to Alzheimer's Disease care, outreach, research, education, a brain banking program, and administration. Contains provisions concerning payments, reporting, reimbursements, and other matters. Makes other changes. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Center for Minority Health Services shall promote awareness of the incidence of Alzheimer's disease and related dementias among minority populations and encourage, promote, and aid in the establishment of prevention and treatment programs and services relating to Alzheimer's disease. Amends the Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Act. Provides that Alzheimer's disease and related disorders affect an estimated 4,500,000 (rather than 1,500,000) Americans and approximately 200,000 (rather than 111,000) Illinois citizens. Provides that the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee shall review and evaluate State programs and services provided by State agencies that are directed toward persons with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias, and recommend changes to improve the State's response to this health problem. Provides that payments to hospitals affiliated with each Regional Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Center shall be effected through the Illinois Department of Public Aid under the Excellence in Alzheimer's Disease Center Treatment Act. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Inserts provisions substantially similar to those of SB 2845, and also amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to provide that the Center for Minority Health Services shall promote awareness of the incidence of Alzheimer's disease and related dementias among minority populations and encourage, promote, and aid in the establishment of prevention and treatment programs and services relating to Alzheimer's disease.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.625 new -
- 30 ILCS 775/20 -
- 30 ILCS 775/36 new -
- 410 ILCS 405/2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6952
- 410 ILCS 405/6 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6956
- 410 ILCS 405/7 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6957