+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5 ILCS 120/1.05 -
- 5 ILCS 120/4 - from Ch. 102, par. 44
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor