+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 31, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bond
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Carole Pankau
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Lauzen
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2008
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that certain information must be provided by the chief county assessment officer in the notice that is sent to each taxpayer. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2008: SB2820 - Third Reading - Friday, May 30, 2008
April 17, 2008: SB2820 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 17, 2008
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor