+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/9-169 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-169