+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1197
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 22, 2010
On May 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010
- Do Pass Energy; 013-000-000
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 50 ILCS 515/25 -
- 105 ILCS 5/19b-1.4 - from Ch. 122, par. 19b-1.4
- 105 ILCS 5/19b-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 19b-3
- 105 ILCS 5/19b-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 19b-5
- 110 ILCS 62/25 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2010: SB2810 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 27, 2010
March 18, 2010: SB2810 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 18, 2010
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor