+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0266
- Effective Date August 17, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that revenue from the sale of timber under the State Forest Act shall be deposited into the Forestry Development Fund (instead of the Wildlife and Fish Fund).
+ − Statute Amended
- 525 ILCS 40/5 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 5906
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0281 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 29, 2007: SB0281 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 29, 2007
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor