+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0817
- Effective Date July 27, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-023-008
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/110-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 110-5
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: SB2809 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 2, 2004: SB2809 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 02, 2004
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor