+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Appropriations I
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations II
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 2-10, Deadlines Extended.
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor