+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1025
- Effective Date January 1, 2015; Some portions effective this date.
- Effective Date August 22, 2014; Some portions effective this date.
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2014
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2014
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Provides that the amendatory changes apply to persons appointed as well as retained by the State or defense to conduct the fitness examination.
House Amendment 001
Further amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person retained by the State or the defense to conduct a fitness examination shall, upon written request, make his or her notes, other evaluations reviewed or relied upon by the testifying witness, and any videotaped interviews available to another examiner of the defendant. Requires a forensic interview to be videotaped, unless impractical. If the interview is not videotaped, the examiner may still testify and the court may only consider the lack of compliance in according the weight and not the admissibility of the expert testimony. Allows an examiner to use these materials as part of a diagnosis or explanation. Prohibits disclosure of the examination's contents except as otherwise provided in the Code. These changes are effective January 1, 2015, and the rest of the bill is effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 725 ILCS 5/104-17 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-17
- 725 ILCS 5/104-18 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-18
- 725 ILCS 5/104-20 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-20
- 725 ILCS 5/104-21 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-21
- 725 ILCS 5/104-23 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-23
- 725 ILCS 5/104-31 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-31
- 730 ILCS 5/5-2-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-2-4
- 725 ILCS 5/104-15 - from Ch. 38, par. 104-15