+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1121
- Sent to the Governor
- Effective Date January 23, 2023
- Governor Approved
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On January 6, 2023 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On December 30, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On December 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-009-000
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass Appropriations; 008-004-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends Public Act 102-698 by adding appropriations to the Department of Employment Security for specified purposes. Effective immediately.